KS SB234 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring electronic prescriptions for controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring electronic prescriptions for controlled substances.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-03-25SenateSenate Hearing continuation: Monday, March 25, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
2019-03-22SenateSenate Hearing: Friday, March 22, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
2019-03-21SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-03-21SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback