KS SB232 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending provisions related to adult care home licensure and receivership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending provisions related to adult care home licensure and receivership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-04-01HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-03-27SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Berger was adopted
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Berger
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-03-20SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
2019-03-19SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-03-18SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback