KS SB228 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - House Referred to Committee on Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending license and renewal application fees for insurance third party administrators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending license and renewal application fees for insurance third party administrators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Insurance
2019-04-01HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-03-27SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 1
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-03-21SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 21, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-03-15SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-03-14SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback