KS SB226 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the appointment of the state librarian and the members of the state library of Kansas board by the legislative coordinating council.
Title
Providing for the appointment of the state librarian and the members of the state library of Kansas board by the legislative coordinating council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 21, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb226/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb226_00_0000.pdf |