KS SB220 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
Pending: Senate Federal and State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Licensure of professional occupations allowing certain persons with criminal or civil records that would otherwise disqualify such persons from licensure to receive a license; add state board of education to exempt agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensure of professional occupations allowing certain persons with criminal or civil records that would otherwise disqualify such persons from licensure to receive a license; add state board of education to exempt agencies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
2019-03-07SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-03-06SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback