KS SB22 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate Concurred with amendments; Yea: 24 Nay: 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Kansas itemized deductions, election, providing for deferred foreign income, global intangible low-taxed income, business interest, capital contributions and FDIC premiums income tax modifications; sales and compensating use tax, imposition of tax, nexus, remote sellers, marketplace facilitators, rate of tax on food and food ingredients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kansas itemized deductions, election, providing for deferred foreign income, global intangible low-taxed income, business interest, capital contributions and FDIC premiums income tax modifications; sales and compensating use tax, imposition of tax, nexus, remote sellers, marketplace facilitators, rate of tax on food and food ingredients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 24 Nay: 16 (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 76 Nay: 43 (Y: 76 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended - Yea: 80 Nay: 42 (Y: 80 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected - Yea: 39 Nay: 81 (Y: 39 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected - Yea: 39 Nay: 82 (Y: 39 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was rejected - Yea: 40 Nay: 81 (Y: 40 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 26 Nay: 14 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed - Yea: 12 Nay: 28 (Y: 12 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateSenate Concurred with amendments; Yea: 24 Nay: 16
2019-03-08HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 76 Nay: 43
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended Yea: 80 Nay: 42
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected Yea: 39 Nay: 81
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Highland was rejected
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Highland
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected Yea: 39 Nay: 82
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was rejected Yea: 40 Nay: 81
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Corbet was adopted
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Corbet
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
2019-02-20HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 112-N
2019-02-19HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 112-N
2019-02-08HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2019-02-08HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-07SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 26 Nay: 14
2019-02-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was rejected
2019-02-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pyle
2019-02-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed Yea: 12 Nay: 28
2019-02-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-01SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Select Committee on Federal Tax Code Implementation
2019-01-31SenateSenate Hearing continuation: Thursday, January 31, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-01-30SenateSenate Hearing continuation: Wednesday, January 30, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-01-29SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, January 29, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-01-18SenateSenate Referred to Select Committee on Federal Tax Code Implementation
2019-01-17SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb22/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb22_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb22_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb22_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb22_03_0000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190206162047_699078/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190207152923_151356/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190307122135_586132/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190307123130_531081/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190307130813_055560/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190307135353_561816/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190308084534_667513/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190314184842_374109/

Bill Comments

feedback