KS SB218 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a duly ordained minister of religion to report certain abuse and neglect of children.
Title
Requiring a duly ordained minister of religion to report certain abuse and neglect of children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-19 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2020-03-18 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 18, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2019-04-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-04-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Introduced |