KS SB215 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring the authority for postsecondary driver's education programs and driver training schools to the department of revenue and authorizing the board of education of a school district to contract with transportation network companies to provide certain transportation services.
Title
Transferring the authority for postsecondary driver's education programs and driver training schools to the department of revenue and authorizing the board of education of a school district to contract with transportation network companies to provide certain transportation services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-31 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 117 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-31 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2022-03-23 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Huebert, Representative Thomas and Representative Stogsdill appointed as conferees |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Baumgardner , Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes as conferees |
2022-03-21 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Esau was withdrawn |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Esau |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education |
2022-03-16 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 16, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 218-N |
2022-03-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-03-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 27, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Introduced |