KS SB215 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 22, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing penalties for domestic battery and amending child endangerment to include domestic battery in the presence of a child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing penalties for domestic battery and amending child endangerment to include domestic battery in the presence of a child.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-22SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, January 22, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-25SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-22SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback