KS SB213 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the attorney general's legal representation duties related to the Kansas open meetings and records acts.
Title
Clarifying the attorney general's legal representation duties related to the Kansas open meetings and records acts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb213/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb213_00_0000.pdf |