KS SB209 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S - CANCELED
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Empowering the KPERS board to develop policies and procedures relating to procurement, enter into certain contracts and allow travel for trustees and employees of the system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Empowering the KPERS board to develop policies and procedures relating to procurement, enter into certain contracts and allow travel for trustees and employees of the system.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S - CANCELED
2019-02-21SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-02-20SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback