KS SB204 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Replacing the definition of "charitable beneficiaries" with "qualified charities" in the technology-enabled fiduciary financial institutions act.
Title
Replacing the definition of "charitable beneficiaries" with "qualified charities" in the technology-enabled fiduciary financial institutions act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and re-referred to Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |