KS SB201 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a property tax exemption for land associated with a dam or reservoir and subject to a mitigation easement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a property tax exemption for land associated with a dam or reservoir and subject to a mitigation easement.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-02-19SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2019-02-18SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback