KS SB20 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 13, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the judicial branch surcharge to fund the costs of non-judicial personnel; extending recognition of tribal court judgments pursuant to supreme court rules; amending the bonding and cost requirements for animals taken into custody under a violation of cruelty to animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending the judicial branch surcharge to fund the costs of non-judicial personnel; extending recognition of tribal court judgments pursuant to supreme court rules; amending the bonding and cost requirements for animals taken into custody under a violation of cruelty to animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 120 Nay: 3 (Y: 120 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 6 (Y: 118 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 13, 2019
2019-05-29SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 6, 2019
2019-05-01SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 5
2019-05-01SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2019-04-04HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 120 Nay: 3
2019-04-04HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2019-04-01HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Patton, Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael appointed as conferees
2019-03-27SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Wilborn , Senator Rucker and Senator Miller as conferees
2019-03-26HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 6
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-07HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2019-02-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-14HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-13SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 5
2019-02-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-07SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-30SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, January 30, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2019-01-18SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-17SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback