KS SB199 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amending bond requirements for appeals in the code of civil procedure.
Title
Amending bond requirements for appeals in the code of civil procedure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 118 Nay: 3 (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 4 (Y: 120 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 32 Nay: 7 (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 118 Nay: 3 (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 4 (Y: 120 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 32 Nay: 7 (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 14, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 08, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-05-02 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 118 Nay: 3 |
2018-05-02 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-05-02 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2018-04-02 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Finch, Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael appointed as conferees |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Wilborn , Senator Lynn and Senator Haley as conferees |
2018-03-29 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 4 |
2018-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-28 | House | House Representative Carmichael raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2018-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Arnberger |
2018-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-07 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 07, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2018-02-15 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-15 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 32 Nay: 7 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 18, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Introduced |