KS SB194 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending provisions related to the revised uniform anatomical gift act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending provisions related to the revised uniform anatomical gift act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-03-12SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
2019-02-22SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-02-21SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Public Health and Welfare; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-18SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-02-15SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback