KS SB192 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the secretary of transportation to designate toll projects on new and existing highways and changing the requirement to fully fund toll projects solely through toll revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the secretary of transportation to designate toll projects on new and existing highways and changing the requirement to fully fund toll projects solely through toll revenue.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-03-06SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S - CANCELED
2019-02-15SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-14SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback