KS SB190 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing transfers from the state general fund to the local ad valorem tax reduction fund and county and city revenue sharing fund if the county has a plan for expansion or modernization of a road or bridge improvement and the plan is approved by the secretary of transportation.
Title
Authorizing transfers from the state general fund to the local ad valorem tax reduction fund and county and city revenue sharing fund if the county has a plan for expansion or modernization of a road or bridge improvement and the plan is approved by the secretary of transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |