KS SB190 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making appropriations for FY 18 and FY 19 for the judicial branch.
Title
Making appropriations for FY 18 and FY 19 for the judicial branch.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing and possible action: Friday, March 17, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb190/ |
Text | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb190_00_0000.pdf |