KS SB19 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - House Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing certain entities to access a criminal defendant's presentence investigation report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing certain entities to access a criminal defendant's presentence investigation report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2019-02-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-14HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-13SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2019-02-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-02-07SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-30SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, January 30, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2019-01-18SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-17SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback