KS SB189 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Senate Hearing continuation: Friday, March 15, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for an increase in registration fees for electric and hybrid vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for an increase in registration fees for electric and hybrid vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateSenate Hearing continuation: Friday, March 15, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-03-12SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-03-07SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S - CANCELED
2019-02-15SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-14SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback