KS SB184 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sunsetting the food sales tax credit and enacting the food sales tax refund.
Title
Sunsetting the food sales tax credit and enacting the food sales tax refund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb184/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb184_00_0000.pdf |