KS SB184 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 184 by Committee on Judiciary - Requiring certain individuals to enter into a payment plan in order to receive restricted driving privileges when driver's license has expired while on suspension.
Title
House Substitute for SB 184 by Committee on Judiciary - Requiring certain individuals to enter into a payment plan in order to receive restricted driving privileges when driver's license has expired while on suspension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2015-03-23 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-20 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 17, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 112N |
2015-02-26 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-26 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 16, 2015, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate Introduced |