KS SB179 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 179 by Committee on Judiciary - Creating juvenile crisis intervention centers, amending the revised Kansas code for care of children and the newborn infant protection act and amending certain powers and duties of the secretary for children and families.
Title
House Substitute for SB 179 by Committee on Judiciary - Creating juvenile crisis intervention centers, amending the revised Kansas code for care of children and the newborn infant protection act and amending certain powers and duties of the secretary for children and families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 14, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-05-02 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2018-05-02 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-05-02 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2018-04-02 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Finch, Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael appointed as conferees |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Wilborn , Senator Lynn and Senator Haley as conferees |
2018-03-29 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2018-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was sustained |
2018-03-28 | House | House Representative Hawkins raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2018-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge |
2018-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-04-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-03 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 07, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Introduced |