KS SB178 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for trust company charter conversions.
Title
Providing for trust company charter conversions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 1 (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 1 (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-22 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kelly, Representative Hoheisel and Representative Xu appointed as conferees |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Fagg and Senator Pittman as conferees |
2021-03-18 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 1 |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Development |
2021-03-15 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 15, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 218-N |
2021-03-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Development |
2021-03-10 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Introduced |