KS SB178 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - House Hearing: Wednesday, April 3, 2019, 3:00 PM Room 582-N
Pending: House Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing a sales tax exemption for nonprofit integrated community care organizations, and requiring the repeal or suspension of existing sales tax exemption when implementing any new exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing a sales tax exemption for nonprofit integrated community care organizations, and requiring the repeal or suspension of existing sales tax exemption when implementing any new exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, April 3, 2019, 3:00 PM Room 582-N
2019-03-22HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2019-03-22HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-03-21SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Suellentrop was adopted
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Suellentrop
2019-02-25SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2019-02-25SenateSenate Hearing: Monday, February 25, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-02-13SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2019-02-13SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback