KS SB176 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the Kansas home inspectors professional competence and financial responsibility act and providing for registration for home inspectors with oversight by the attorney general.
Title
Enacting the Kansas home inspectors professional competence and financial responsibility act and providing for registration for home inspectors with oversight by the attorney general.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 24, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Introduced |