KS SB173 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - House Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the board of regents on behalf of the university of Kansas to sell certain real property in Douglas county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the board of regents on behalf of the university of Kansas to sell certain real property in Douglas county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-14HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-03-13SenateSenate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 38 Nay: 0
2019-02-25SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2019-02-21SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 21, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-02-13SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-13SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback