KS SB171 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Senate Hearing: Friday, February 22, 2019, 11:00 AM Room 152 S - CANCELED
Pending: Senate Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requirements for Kansas public water supply loans and lead level limitations for installation or repair to public water supply systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requirements for Kansas public water supply loans and lead level limitations for installation or repair to public water supply systems.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22SenateSenate Hearing: Friday, February 22, 2019, 11:00 AM Room 152 S - CANCELED
2019-02-21SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 21, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 548-S
2019-02-20SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 548-S - CANCELED
2019-02-13SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Utilities
2019-02-13SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback