KS SB168 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the Kansas home inspectors professional competence and financial responsibility act.
Title
Enacting the Kansas home inspectors professional competence and financial responsibility act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing continuation: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb168/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb168_00_0000.pdf |