KS SB166 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring public disclosure of an application for a transmission line siting permit under the jurisdiction of the state corporation commission.
Title
Requiring public disclosure of an application for a transmission line siting permit under the jurisdiction of the state corporation commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and re-referred to Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Utilities |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 548-S |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate Introduced |