KS SB164 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making licenses issued by the division of alcoholic beverage control effective on the date stated on the license.
Title
Making licenses issued by the division of alcoholic beverage control effective on the date stated on the license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-03-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |