KS SB162 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for an emergency expansion of the employment security board of review with a sunset of June 30, 2024.
Title
Providing for an emergency expansion of the employment security board of review with a sunset of June 30, 2024.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |