KS SB161 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Senate No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Senate No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the use of personal package delivery devices on sidewalks and crosswalks, exempting such devices from motor vehicle regulation and limiting additional municipal regulation.
Title
Providing for the use of personal package delivery devices on sidewalks and crosswalks, exempting such devices from motor vehicle regulation and limiting additional municipal regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 22 Nay: 17 (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 75 Nay: 47 (Y: 75 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 24 Nay: 15 (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 75 Nay: 47 (Y: 75 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 24 Nay: 15 (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Monday, April 11, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 1, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments; Yea: 22 Nay: 17 |
2022-03-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 75 Nay: 47 |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2022-03-15 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 15, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2022-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 8, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 582-N - CANCELED |
2022-03-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-03-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 24 Nay: 15 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator O'Shea was adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator O'Shea |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 24, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |