KS SB16 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Saturday, April 6, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

House Substitute for SB 16 by Committee on K-12 Education Budget – Making appropriations for the department of education for FY 2020 and FY 2021 in response to litigation; increasing BASE aid for certain school years; and other amendments related to education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Substitute for SB 16 by Committee on K-12 Education Budget – Making appropriations for the department of education for FY 2020 and FY 2021 in response to litigation; increasing BASE aid for certain school years; and other amendments related to education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 31 Nay: 8 (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 76 Nay: 47 (Y: 76 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 63 Nay: 61 (Y: 63 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Stogsdill was rejected - Yea: 55 Nay: 68 (Y: 55 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hensley was rejected - Yea: 12 Nay: 28 (Y: 12 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Saturday, April 6, 2019
2019-05-01SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Saturday, April 6, 2019
2019-04-04SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 31 Nay: 8
2019-04-04HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 76 Nay: 47
2019-04-04HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2019-03-27HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Williams, Representative Hoffman and Representative Winn appointed as conferees
2019-03-27SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Baumgardner , Senator Denning and Senator Hensley as conferees
2019-03-26HouseHouse Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 63 Nay: 61
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Stogsdill was rejected Yea: 55 Nay: 68
2019-03-25HouseHouse Representative Williams raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Stogsdill
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Francis was adopted
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Francis
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2019-03-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2019-03-18HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 546-S
2019-02-28HouseHouse Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2019-02-28HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-27SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hensley was rejected Yea: 12 Nay: 28
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hensley
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
2019-02-07SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 7, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
2019-01-17SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Education
2019-01-16SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb16/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb16_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb16_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb16_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb16_03_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb16_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190226144612_040697/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190227104550_771182/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190325231156_708551/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190326115800_914581/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190404154359_322756/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190404180746_921233/

Bill Comments

feedback