KS SB158 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 158 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Creating the Kansas medical marijuana regulation act.
Title
House Substitute for SB 158 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Creating the Kansas medical marijuana regulation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 79 Nay: 42 (Y: 79 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Smith, E. was rejected - Yea: 37 Nay: 81 (Y: 37 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Waggoner was adopted - Yea: 60 Nay: 55 (Y: 60 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Waggoner was adopted - Yea: 73 Nay: 47 (Y: 73 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Proctor was rejected - Yea: 39 Nay: 79 (Y: 39 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Howe was rejected - Yea: 45 Nay: 73 (Y: 45 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Smith, E. was rejected - Yea: 37 Nay: 81 (Y: 37 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Waggoner was adopted - Yea: 60 Nay: 55 (Y: 60 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Waggoner was adopted - Yea: 73 Nay: 47 (Y: 73 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Proctor was rejected - Yea: 39 Nay: 79 (Y: 39 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Howe was rejected - Yea: 45 Nay: 73 (Y: 45 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: (opponents) Wednesday, January 19, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: (proponents) Tuesday, January 18, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Referred to Committee on Interstate Cooperation |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Ruled materially changed and referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-05-06 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 79 Nay: 42 |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carpenter, B. was adopted |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carpenter, B. |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carpenter, B. was adopted |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carpenter, B. |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Smith, E. was withdrawn |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Smith, E. |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Smith, E. was rejected Yea: 37 Nay: 81 |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Smith, E. |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Coleman was rejected |
2021-05-06 | House | House Representative Carpenter, B. raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Coleman |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Waggoner was adopted |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Waggoner |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Waggoner was rejected |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Waggoner |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Waggoner was adopted Yea: 60 Nay: 55 |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Waggoner |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Waggoner was rejected |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Waggoner |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Waggoner was adopted Yea: 73 Nay: 47 |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Waggoner |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Coleman was rejected |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Coleman |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kessler was rejected |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Kessler |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Proctor was rejected Yea: 39 Nay: 79 |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Proctor |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Proctor was rejected |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Proctor |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Proehl was adopted |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Proehl |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Finney was adopted |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Finney |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Howe was rejected Yea: 45 Nay: 73 |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Howe |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hoye was rejected |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hoye |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2021-05-06 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2021-05-05 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-04-06 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-03-31 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-03-26 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-03-26 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 17, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Rereferred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Transportation; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Introduced |