KS SB158 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating the state dance as the polka.
Title
Designating the state dance as the polka.
Sponsors
Rep. Vic Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 23, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |