KS SB158 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a CARE family program for foster care.
Title
Establishing a CARE family program for foster care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 12, 2015, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/sb158/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/sb158_00_0000.pdf |