KS SB157 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - House Hearing: Monday, March 9, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating presumptions related to temporary parenting plans and defining related terms under the Kansas family law code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating presumptions related to temporary parenting plans and defining related terms under the Kansas family law code.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 9, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2020-02-07HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-06HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2020-02-04SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
2020-02-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
2020-02-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wilborn was adopted
2020-02-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Wilborn
2020-02-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-07SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-26SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-25SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-13SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-13SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback