KS SB156 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations for the department of education for FY 2020; increasing the at-risk weighting; continuing the 20 mill statewide property tax levy for schools and exempting certain portion of property used for residential purposes from such levy.
Title
Appropriations for the department of education for FY 2020; increasing the at-risk weighting; continuing the 20 mill statewide property tax levy for schools and exempting certain portion of property used for residential purposes from such levy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Education; Referred to Senate Select Committee on Education Finance |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb156/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb156_00_0000.pdf |