KS SB15 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 22, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amending public health provisions relating to behavioral sciences regulatory board professional licensure, naturopathic doctor scope of practice and adult care home licensure and receivership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending public health provisions relating to behavioral sciences regulatory board professional licensure, naturopathic doctor scope of practice and adult care home licensure and receivership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 22, 2019
2019-05-01SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2019
2019-04-05SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
2019-04-04HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 1
2019-04-04HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2019-04-03HouseHouse Representative Landwehr, Representative Eplee, and Representative Murnan are appointed to replace Representative Kelly, Representative Orr, and Representative Finney on the Conference Committee
2019-04-03SenateSenate Senator Suellentrop, Senator Berger, and Senator Bollier are appointed to replace Senator Olson, Senator Billinger, and Senator Ware on the Conference Committee
2019-04-01HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kelly, Representative Orr and Representative Finney appointed as conferees
2019-03-27SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Olson , Senator Billinger and Senator Ware as conferees
2019-03-26HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-25HouseHouse Representative Cox raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Benson
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
2019-03-11HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 11, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 281-N
2019-02-28HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
2019-02-28HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-27SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-02-06SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 6, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-01-22SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, January 22, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S - CANCELED
2019-01-15SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-01-14SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback