KS SB145 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Kansas department of wildlife, parks and tourism to purchase land in Kingman county.
Title
Authorizing the Kansas department of wildlife, parks and tourism to purchase land in Kingman county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 33 Nay: 7 (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2021-03-26 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-26 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 33 Nay: 7 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 15, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Introduced |