KS SB144 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
Pending: Senate Public Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing the use of expedited partner therapy to treat a sexually transmitted disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing the use of expedited partner therapy to treat a sexually transmitted disease.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
2019-02-12SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-02-11SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback