KS SB140 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing income tax and privilege tax credits for contributions to the Eisenhower foundation.
Title
Establishing income tax and privilege tax credits for contributions to the Eisenhower foundation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2020-03-09 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hardy was adopted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hardy |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |