KS SB133 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and referred to Committee of the Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying when a receipt of property seized by law enforcement should be sent to the court and who seized weapons should be returned to.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying when a receipt of property seized by law enforcement should be sent to the court and who seized weapons should be returned to.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and referred to Committee of the Whole
2019-02-27SenateSenate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-25SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-21SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 21, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-11SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-08SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback