KS SB133 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying when a receipt of property seized by law enforcement should be sent to the court and who seized weapons should be returned to.
Title
Clarifying when a receipt of property seized by law enforcement should be sent to the court and who seized weapons should be returned to.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and referred to Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 21, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |