KS SB131 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating funeral processions and permitting funeral escorts to direct traffic for funeral processions.
Title
Regulating funeral processions and permitting funeral escorts to direct traffic for funeral processions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-03 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 28 Nay: 9 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 24, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate Introduced |