KS SB130 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 15, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Substitute for Senate Bill 130 by the Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government—Permitting persons voting an advance ballot to correct a signature deficiency, permitting any county to allow voting at any polling place on election day, establishing June 1 as the filing deadline for municipalities where a primary is not required, providing flexibility for when township officers take the oath of office, providing flexibility for school districts for the election of officers and establishing the schedule for meetings and allowing the question of changing the method of election or voting plan to be held at any primary or general election as well as at a special election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substitute for Senate Bill 130 by the Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government—Permitting persons voting an advance ballot to correct a signature deficiency, permitting any county to allow voting at any polling place on election day, establishing June 1 as the filing deadline for municipalities where a primary is not required, providing flexibility for when township officers take the oath of office, providing flexibility for school districts for the election of officers and establishing the schedule for meetings and allowing the question of changing the method of election or voting plan to be held at any primary or general election as well as at a special election.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 3 (Y: 119 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 15, 2019
2019-04-05SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 5, 2019
2019-04-04SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 1
2019-04-03HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 3
2019-04-03HouseHouse Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed
2019-04-03HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2019-04-01HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Sutton, Representative Carpenter, B. and Representative Parker appointed as conferees
2019-03-27SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Bowers , Senator Hardy and Senator Haley as conferees
2019-03-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Elections
2019-03-14HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
2019-02-28HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Elections
2019-02-28HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-27SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2019-02-25SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
2019-02-20SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 142-S
2019-02-11SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
2019-02-08SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback