KS SB13 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, March 25 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, March 25 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing victim notification on status change of person confined.
Title
Allowing victim notification on status change of person confined.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, March 25 , 2015 |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 20, 2015 |
2015-03-16 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 0 |
2015-03-11 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2015-03-09 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 152S |
2015-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 27, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 118-N |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |