KS SB126 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the sale of alcoholic liquor by class A clubs at special events under the club and drinking establishment act.
Title
Authorizing the sale of alcoholic liquor by class A clubs at special events under the club and drinking establishment act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 36 Nay: 1 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died on House Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-03-11 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 11, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2021-03-02 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-03-02 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 36 Nay: 1 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 23, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate Introduced |